Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3136108

EP3136108 - MOVABLE LOADING ELEMENT FOR LOADING AN AUTOMATED ANALYSIS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2017/09]
Inventor(s)01 / HUBER, David
Schlösslistrasse 1c
6030 Ebikon / CH
02 / SANGERMANO, Marco
Lauerzring 8
6010 Kriens / CH
 [2017/09]
Representative(s)Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
[2017/09]
Application number, filing date15182497.626.08.2015
[2017/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3136108
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01N35/04, B01L9/00
[2017/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
Former [2017/09]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEWEGLICHES LADEELEMENT ZUM LADEN EINES AUTOMATISIERTEN ANALYSESYSTEMS[2017/09]
English:MOVABLE LOADING ELEMENT FOR LOADING AN AUTOMATED ANALYSIS SYSTEM[2017/09]
French:ÉLÉMENT DE CHARGEMENT MOBILE POUR UN SYSTÈME D'ANALYSE AUTOMATISÉ[2017/09]
Examination procedure26.08.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2004013640  (LAB INTERLINK [US]) [X] 1,15 * figure 1 * * page 1, line 6 - line 9 * * page 6, line 1 - line 2 * * page 6, line 5 - line 8 * * page 6, line 15 - line 20 * [I] 4-11;
 [I]EP2889626  (SYSMEX CORP [JP]) [I] 1-15 * figures 4A-4F,5A-5C,14A * * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0038] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0117] *;
 [A]US2015093834  (KNECHT URS [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0097] *;
 [A]JP2003083997  (ALOKA CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *