Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2990309

EP2990309 - SIDE WALL CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR
published on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Winterhoff GmbH
Egenstrasse 2
58339 Breckerfeld / DE
[2016/40]
Former [2016/09]For all designated states
Gebr. Vitte GmbH & Co.
Egenstraße 2
58339 Breckerfeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WINTERHOFF, Ulrich
Egenstr. 2
58339 Breckerfeld / DE
 [2016/09]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/03]
Former [2016/09]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date15183201.131.08.2015
[2016/09]
Priority number, dateDE20141011257601.09.2014         Original published format: DE102014112576
[2016/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2990309
Date:02.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2990309
Date:17.01.2018
Language:DE
[2018/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:B62D33/037
[2016/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/40]
Former [2016/09]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BORDWANDVERSCHLUSS[2016/09]
English:SIDE WALL CLOSURE[2016/09]
French:FERMETURE DE HAYON[2016/09]
Examination procedure24.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/40]
30.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2017Fee for grant paid
08.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)18.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
BE31.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
FR31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
LU31.08.2018
[2019/38]
Former [2019/21]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
LU31.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/43]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/39]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2611077  (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1 * figures 5,6; claims 1,5 * * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 4 *;
 [A]DE29814325U  (GUSTAV KREMEN KIPPERBAU GMBH [AT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2567882  (NATALI GIANFRANCO [CH]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *
by applicantDE2308744
 DE202006011082U