EP2985044 - CANISTER STATUS DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Revocation of patent | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew PLC 15 Adam Street London WC2N 6LA / GB | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERNON-HARCOURT, Edward Old Cottage West The Street Bury, Pulborough RH20 1PF / GB | 02 /
TURNER, Jake 1 Hamden Way Papworth Everard Cambridge CB23 3UG / GB | 03 /
GORDON, Benjamin 95 Fishers Lane Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9HL / GB | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Smith & Nephew Group Legal Department PO Box 81 101 Hessle Road Hull HU3 2BN / GB | ||
Former [2016/07] | Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 15183456.1 | 09.07.2008 | [2016/07] | Priority number, date | GB20070015259 | 06.08.2007 Original published format: GB 0715259 | [2016/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2985044 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2985044 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
A61M1/96 (EP,US);
A61M1/732 (US);
A61M1/74 (EP,US);
A61M1/90 (US);
A61M1/982 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2016/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KANISTERSTATUSBESTIMMUNG | [2016/07] | English: | CANISTER STATUS DETERMINATION | [2016/07] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE L'ÉTAT D'UNE CARTOUCHE | [2016/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 22.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08775890.0 / EP2187990 | Divisional application(s) | EP18153512.1 / EP3345634 | EP20195159.7 / EP3785744 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.2018
19.12.2018
ADMISSIBLE KCI Licensing Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265 / US Opponent's representative Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2019/34] |
Former [2019/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.2018
19.12.2018
ADMISSIBLE KCI Licensing Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265 / US Opponent's representative Nicolle, Frederick Joseph Simmons & Simmons LLP CityPoint One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | 04.01.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.05.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.02.2024 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/12] | Appeal following opposition | 09.07.2020 | Appeal received No. T1569/20 | 10.09.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 06.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2008 | AT | 14.03.2018 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | ES | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | IT | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | SE | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | LU | 09.07.2018 | MT | 09.07.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | NL | 01.08.2022 | [2023/29] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 09.07.2008 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.07.2018 | ||
MT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 09.07.2008 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.07.2018 | ||
MT | 09.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.07.2018 | ||
MT | 09.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.07.2018 | ||
MT | 09.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]GB2307180 (KCI MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [XD] 1,2,5,9-13,16 * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 6, lines 6-14 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 3 * * figures 1,4 * [Y] 6,14,17; | [A]WO0061206 (KCI LICENSING INC [US], et al) [A] 10,16 * page 13 *; | [XY]US2002198503 (RISK JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9-13 * paragraphs [0006] , [0043] , [0053] - [0056] - [0067]; figure 2 * [Y] 6,14; | [A]US2003040687 (BOYNTON THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 10,16* paragraphs [0033] , [0047] *; | [Y]WO2007019038 (VOGEL RICHARD C [US]) [Y] 6,14,17 * page 11 - page 12 * | Opposition | WO2006046060 | WO2006100053 | US2007032762 | US2007167927 | US2008281281 | WO2009019496 |