EP2993298 - ACTUATING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A DARKENING DEVICE, FOR ACTUATION WITH A THREAD ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hunter Douglas Industries Switzerland GmbH Adligenswilerstrasse 37 6006 Luzern / CH | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gramsch, Wilfried Bördestraße 4 27616 Beverstedt / DE | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Tappe, Udo, et al Zacco Patent- und Rechtsanwalts GmbH Am Wall 187-189 28195 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Tappe, Udo, et al zacco Dr. Peters & Partner Am Wall 187-189 28195 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2016/10] | Girodo, Marco, et al zacco Dr. Peters & Partner Am Wall 187-189 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 15184077.4 | 07.09.2015 | [2016/10] | Priority number, date | DE20141012963 | 08.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014012963 | [2016/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2993298 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2993298 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/326, E06B9/42 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
E06B9/42 (EP,US);
E06B9/368 (US);
F16H19/06 (US);
E06B2009/3265 (EP,US);
E06B2009/425 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2016/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE VERSCHATTUNGSANLAGE, ZUM BETÄTIGEN MIT EINEM STRANGELEMENT | [2016/10] | English: | ACTUATING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A DARKENING DEVICE, FOR ACTUATION WITH A THREAD ELEMENT | [2016/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT, EN PARTICULIER POUR UNE INSTALLATION D'OMBRAGE, A ACTIONNER A L'AIDE D'UN ELEMENT DE TIGE | [2016/10] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 13.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2015 | AL | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | MT | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.09.2015 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.09.2015 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 25.10.2017 | |
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]US6116325 (COLSON WENDELL B [US], et al) [XD] 1-9,11 * column 8, line 25 - column 9, line 36; figures 4, 10-13 *[A] 10; | [XA]US2012017399 (HUANG HSIEN-TE [TW]) [X] 1-9,11 * paragraphs [0045] - [0053]; figures 11-17 * [A] 10 | by applicant | US6116325 |