Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2996317

EP2996317 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING SPECIALIZED MODE ACCORDING TO DATE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE SUPPORTING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2019/32]
Former [2016/11]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Bona
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / NAN, Meihua
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / CHOI, Yoonjeong
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / KANG, Hyejin
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / LIM, Donghoe
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2016/11]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/32]
Former [2016/11]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15184430.509.09.2015
[2016/11]
Priority number, dateKR2014012099312.09.2014         Original published format: KR 20140120993
[2016/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2996317
Date:16.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2996317
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/725, G06F3/16, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484
[2019/08]
Former International [2016/11]H04M1/725
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/29]
Former [2016/11]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES SPEZIALISIERTEN MODUS GEMÄSS DATUM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2016/11]
English:METHOD FOR PROVIDING SPECIALIZED MODE ACCORDING TO DATE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE SUPPORTING THE SAME[2016/11]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR UN MODE SPÉCIALISÉ SELON LA DATE ET SON SUPPORT DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE[2016/11]
Examination procedure13.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/29]
01.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.01.2019
15.01.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2019Fee for grant paid
26.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013130669  (XIAO HONG [US], et al) [X] 1,16 * paragraphs [0010] , [0035] - [0040] - [0044] - [0048] - [0 62] - [0069] * [I] 2-15;
 [XI]EP2469813  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,6,16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0144] , [0177] , [0247] * * paragraphs [0264] , [0291] , [0319] - [0326] - [0351] * [I] 2-5,7-15
ExaminationUS2009165145
 US2014123022
 EP2750054
 EP2503764