Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3000498

EP3000498 - AUTOINJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Owen Mumford Limited
Brook Hill Woodstock
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX20 1TU / GB
[2016/13]
Inventor(s)01 / COWE, Toby
c/o Owen Mumford Limited
Brook Hill
Woodstock
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX20 1TU / GB
 [2016/13]
Representative(s)Wynne-Jones IP Limited
2nd Floor, 5210 Valiant Court
Gloucester Business Park
Gloucester
Gloucestershire GL3 4FE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/15]Wynne-Jones, Lainé and James LLP
Essex Place
22 Rodney Road
Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Former [2016/13]Wynne-Jones, Laine and James LLP
Essex Place
22 Rodney Road
Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Application number, filing date15184955.121.10.2010
[2016/13]
Priority number, dateGB2009001844321.10.2009         Original published format: GB 0918443
GB2010001736314.10.2010         Original published format: GB 201017363
US20100394896P20.10.2010         Original published format: US 394896 P
[2016/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3000498
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3000498
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3000498
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/20, A61M5/315, A61M5/32
[2016/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/13]
TitleGerman:AUTOINJEKTOR[2016/13]
English:AUTOINJECTOR[2016/13]
French:AUTO-INJECTEUR[2016/13]
Examination procedure09.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/13]
22.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2018Fee for grant paid
27.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10781990.6  / EP2490735
Divisional application(s)EP18166692.6  / EP3366337
Opposition(s)14.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
09.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
09.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
IE21.10.2018
LU21.10.2018
MT21.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/48]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
IE21.10.2018
LU21.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
Former [2019/38]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
LU21.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
Former [2019/30]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
LU21.10.2018
Former [2019/28]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL11.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2009063030  (SHL GROUP AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 6, line 8 - line 16 * * page 8, line 10 - line 33 * * figures 1, 7-10, 13 *