Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3000416

EP3000416 - APPARATUS FOR USE IN ARTHROPLASTY ON A KNEE JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
[2016/13]
Inventor(s)01 / PINCZEWSKI, Leo, Arieh
286 Pacific Highway
Sydney, New South Wales 2065 / AU
02 / PARKER, Stephen, John
54 Holt Avenue
Mosman, New South Wales 2088 / AU
 [2016/13]
Representative(s)Smith & Nephew
Group Legal Department
PO Box 81
101 Hessle Road
Hull HU3 2BN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/13]Smith & Nephew
Group Research Centre
York Science Park
Heslington
York YO10 5DF / GB
Application number, filing date15185348.809.03.2001
[2016/13]
Priority number, dateAU2000PQ0616110.03.2000         Original published format: AU PQ616100
AU2000PQ0899925.07.2000         Original published format: AU PQ899900
AU2000PQ0904427.07.2000         Original published format: AU PQ904400
AU2000PQ0904527.07.2000         Original published format: AU PQ904500
[2016/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3000416
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3000416
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/14, A61B17/15, A61B17/56, A61B17/90, A61B17/16, A61F2/38
[2016/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2017/13]
Former [2016/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN ARTHROPLASTIE AN EINEM KNIEGELENK[2016/13]
English:APPARATUS FOR USE IN ARTHROPLASTY ON A KNEE JOINT[2016/13]
French:APPAREIL DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS ARTHROPLASTIE D'UNE ARTICULATION DU GENOU[2016/13]
Examination procedure15.09.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/13]
29.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/17]
18.12.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01911257.2  / EP1263331
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability
19.12.2017Request for further processing filed
19.12.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.04.2018Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
29.05.2017Request for further processing filed
29.05.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.06.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9110408  (ZIMMER INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-14 * abstract * * figures 2,3,5,11-13 *;
 [X]FR2776176  (AESCULAP SA [FR]) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]EP0682916  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4938762  (WEHRLI ULRICH [CH]) [X] 1,9 * figures 1,2,5-8 * * column 6, line 8 - column 8, line 48 * * claim 20 *;
 [X]US5681316  (DEORIO JAMES K [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-4,7 *;
 [X]US6024746  (KATZ LAWRENCE [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 45 * * column 22, lines 54-60 *;
 [XAI]FR2679766  (SOPHIA MED [FR]) [X] 15,16,19 * figures 1,3,5-8,14,16,17 * [A] 21 [I] 20;
 [X]US5669914  (ECKHOFF DONALD G [US]) [X] 15,16 * figures 1,3 *;
 [X]US5749876  (DUVILLIER ERIC [FR], et al) [X] 15-17 * figures 3,3A-3C * * column 1, line 7 - line 19 * * column 8, line 44 - column 10, line 33 *;
 [X]DE29720105U  (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 15,16 * figures 1-2 *;
 [IA]US5935128  (CARTER PETER R [US], et al) [I] 15-20 * figures 1-3,10-11 * [A] 21
by applicantUS5171244
 US5520695