Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3012657

EP3012657 - DETERMINING THE DIRECTION OF TRAVEL OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Idemia Identity & Security France
2 place Samuel de Champlain
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2018/51]
Former [2016/17]For all designated states
Morpho
11 Boulevard Galliéni
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ROMBAUX, Sylvain
c/o MORPHO Direction Technique
Service Propriété Intellectuelle
11 boulevard Gallieni
92445 Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR
02 / GUIDON, Eric
c/o MORPHO Direction Technique
Service Propriété Intellectuelle
11 boulevard Gallieni
92445 Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/17]01 / ROMBAUX, Sylvain
c/o MORPHO Direction Technique
Service Propriété Intellectuelle
11 boulevard Gallieni
92445 ISSY-LES-MOULINEAUX / FR
02 / GUIDON, Eric
c/o MORPHO Direction Technique
Service Propriété Intellectuelle
11 boulevard Gallieni
92445 ISSY-LES-MOULINEAUX / FR
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/17]Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date15185724.017.09.2015
[2016/17]
Priority number, dateFR2014006006520.10.2014         Original published format: FR 1460065
[2016/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3012657
Date:27.04.2016
Language:FR
[2016/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/62, G01S13/92, G08G1/054, G08G1/017, G08G1/056
[2016/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/47]
Former [2016/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG DER BEWEGUNGSRICHTUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS[2016/17]
English:DETERMINING THE DIRECTION OF TRAVEL OF A VEHICLE[2016/17]
French:DÉTERMINATION DU SENS DE DÉPLACEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE[2016/17]
Examination procedure12.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.10.2016Examination requested  [2016/47]
23.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP0933648  (CHL NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) [I] 1,3,5-7,9 * paragraphs [0013] - [0022] * [Y] 2,4,8-10;
 [Y]EP1610279  (SAGEM [FR]) [Y] 2,4,8-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7038614  (AKER JOHN L [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4740045  (GOODSON WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1528409  (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2873480  (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *