Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3020428

EP3020428 - WEARABLE AUTOMATIC INJECTION DEVICE FOR CONTROLLED ADMINISTRATION OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AbbVie Inc.
1 North Waukegan Road
North Chicago, IL 60064 / US
[2016/20]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSON, Philip, D.
401 Buckingham Place
Libertyville, Illinois 60048 / US
02 / JULIAN, Joseph, F.
629 Dawes Street
Libertyville, Illinois 60048 / US
03 / LAURUSONIS, Linas, P.
6016 Golfview Drive
Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US
04 / CORRIGAN, Sean
2439 N. Albany Ave. N. 3N
Chicago, Illinois 60647 / US
05 / STRAHM, Chris
6939 Circle Tram Way N. 4
Deforest, Wisconsin 53532 / US
06 / FIENUP, William
13045 Wheatfield Farm Road
St. Louis, Missouri 63141 / US
07 / MATUSAITIS, Tomas
3041 W. Eastwood Avenue
Chicago, Illinois 60625 / US
 [2016/20]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/20]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date15185881.823.04.2012
[2016/20]
Priority number, dateUS201161478039P21.04.2011         Original published format: US 201161478039 P
[2016/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3020428
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/142, A61M5/24, A61M5/32
[2016/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/10]
Former [2016/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Former [2016/20]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TRAGBARE AUTOMATISCHE INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUR GESTEUERTEN VERABREICHUNG VON THERAPEUTIKA[2016/20]
English:WEARABLE AUTOMATIC INJECTION DEVICE FOR CONTROLLED ADMINISTRATION OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS[2016/20]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION AUTOMATIQUE PORTABLE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION CONTRÔLÉE D'AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES[2016/20]
Examination procedure18.09.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.11.2016Examination requested  [2016/52]
09.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12719852.1  / EP2699286
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
08.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US5860957  (JACOBSEN STEPHEN C [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,3,10 * * column 2, line 40 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 3 * * column 9, lines 11-13 * * column 10, lines 21-27 *;
 [Y]WO2010029054  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [Y] 1,2,7-11 * figures 4, 5, 12, 16, 18 * * page 2, lines 26-29 * * page 3, lines 4-12 * * page 5, lines 23-24 * * page 7, lines 1-7, 13-20, 29-31 * * page 8, lines 10-12 * * page 12, line 34 - page 13, line 5 * * page 15, lines 21-24 * * page 20, lines 13-15 * * page 28, lines 13-19 * * page 29, lines 33-34 *;
 [Y]US2009093792  (GROSS YOSSI [IL], et al) [Y] 1 * figures 1a,2,7a-c * * paragraph [0005] *;
 [Y]WO2011014514  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [Y] 1,12-15 * page 1, lines 14-15 * * figures 9,10 *;
 [Y]US2001025168  (GROSS JOSEPH [IL], et al) [Y] 1,3-6 * figures 2,6 * * paragraph [0001] *;
 [Y]WO2004024211  (CHILDRENS HOSP MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0059] , [0060] *;
 [A]WO03039433  (UNIV NEWCASTLE RES ASS [AU], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 15-18 *;
 [A]US2010168683  (CABIRI OZ [IL]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-8 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] * * sentence 5, paragraph 9 *
by applicantUS3910260
 US4004577
 US4689042
 US4755169
 US4795433
 US3941130
 US4261358
 US5085642
 US5092843
 US5102393
 US5267963
 US6149626
 US6270479
 US6371939
 WO2008005315
 US6090382
 US6258562
 US6509015
 US7223394
 US5656272
 WO0212502
 US7521206
 US7250165
 US6593458
 US6498237
 US6451983
 US6448380
 WO9103553
 WO9406476
 EP0184187
 EP0171496
 EP0173494
 WO8601533
 US4816567
 EP0125023
 US5225539
 US5530101
 US5585089
 US5693761
 US5693762
 WO9007861
    - PENNICA, D. ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 724 - 729
    - DAVIS, J.M. ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 26, pages 1322 - 1326
    - JONES, E.Y. ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 338, pages 225 - 228
    - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546
    - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426
    - HUSTON, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883
    - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - POLJAK, STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123
    - BETTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043
    - LIU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 3439 - 3443
    - LIU ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 139, pages 3521 - 3526
    - SUN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 214 - 218
    - NISHIMURA ET AL., CANCER RES., (1987), vol. 47, pages 999 - 1005
    - WOOD ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 446 - 449
    - SHAW ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER LNST., (1988), vol. 80, pages 1553 - 1559
    - MORRISON, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 1202 - 1207
    - OI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUCS, (1986), vol. 4, page 214
    - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 552 - 525
    - VERHOEYAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, page 1534
    - BEIDLER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 141, pages 4053 - 4060
    - QUEEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 10033
 WO1986US02269