Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3020428 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3020428



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 716
15.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.11.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
15.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.11.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.10.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
24.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.09.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.05.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
14.05.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
03.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
03.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.12.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.07.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.07.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.05.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
05.02.2018 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
29.01.2018 Withdrawal of designation of a Contracting State Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
03.01.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
03.01.2018 Description Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 Description Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
18.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.12.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
18.12.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
18.12.2017 Description Search / examination 2
18.12.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.12.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
10.10.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.06.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.06.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.11.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
29.11.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
17.11.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
17.11.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
17.11.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
17.11.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
17.11.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.11.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.11.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.05.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.04.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.04.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.03.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.03.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 6
21.03.2016 European search report Search / examination 4
21.03.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
21.12.2015 Description Search / examination 126
21.12.2015 Drawings Search / examination 58
21.12.2015 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 Deficiencies in application documents - annex B Search / examination 3
18.09.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.09.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
18.09.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
18.09.2015 Description Search / examination 126
18.09.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
18.09.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.09.2015 Drawings Search / examination 58
18.09.2015 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 6
18.09.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
18.09.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
14.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 196