Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3020428


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.09.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.05.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.12.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.08.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.04.2018 Change - representative
13.04.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.02.2018 Change - designated states published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
19.12.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.10.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.06.2017 First examination report
12.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2016 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
25.11.2016 Request for examination filed published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
25.11.2016 Change - designated states published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
21.11.2016 Amendment by applicant
17.05.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.09.2015 Change - representative