Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3001509

EP3001509 - CONNECTOR MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2017/17]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2016/13]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sarraf, David Bruce
303 Arch Street
Elizabethtown, PA 17022 / US
02 / Malstrom, Charles Randall
1006 Kiner Avenue
Lebanon, PA 17042 / US
03 / Laub, Michael Fredrick
5750 Aspen Lane
Enola, PA 17025 / US
04 / Campbell, Craig Maurice
5275 Terrace Road
Mechanicsburg, PA 17050 / US
 [2016/13]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2017/17]
Former [2016/13]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date15186545.823.09.2015
[2016/13]
Priority number, dateUS20141449468024.09.2014         Original published format: US201414494680
[2016/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3001509
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3001509
Date:26.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01R12/71, H01R12/72, H01R13/506, H01R13/03, G06K7/00, // H01R13/24
[2016/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
Former [2016/13]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERBINDERMODUL[2016/13]
English:CONNECTOR MODULE[2016/13]
French:MODULE CONNECTEUR[2016/13]
Examination procedure23.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/44]
09.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2017Fee for grant paid
16.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.09.2015
AT26.04.2017
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MK26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
IE23.09.2017
LU23.09.2017
MT23.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU23.09.2015
AT26.04.2017
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
IE23.09.2017
LU23.09.2017
MT23.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
Former [2019/31]HU23.09.2015
AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
IE23.09.2017
LU23.09.2017
MT23.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
Former [2018/43]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
IE23.09.2017
LU23.09.2017
MT23.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
Former [2018/39]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
IE23.09.2017
LU23.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
Former [2018/34]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
IE23.09.2017
LU23.09.2017
Former [2018/30]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
LU23.09.2017
Former [2018/25]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL26.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012108110  (LI KE [CN]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO2011150307  (MOLEX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0041]; figures 5-9 *;
 [A]US2010184310  (TOCHI AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0051]; figure 3 *