EP3002377 - FLOOR DRAIN WITH SIPHON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kohler Mira Limited Cromwell Road, Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL52 5EP / GB | [2016/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLLAND, Stuart Kohler Mira Limited Cromwell Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL52 5EP / GB | 02 /
TUSTAIN, Julia Kohler Mira Limited Cromwell Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL52 5EP / GB | 03 /
NICHOLS, John Kohler Mira Limited Cromwell Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL52 5EP / GB | [2016/14] | Representative(s) | Patel, Binesh Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/14] | Wightman, David Alexander 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15188018.4 | 01.10.2015 | [2016/14] | Priority number, date | GB20140017458 | 02.10.2014 Original published format: GB 201417458 | [2016/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3002377 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/04, F16L19/065, F16L25/14 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
E03C1/28 (GB);
E03C1/284 (GB);
E03C1/29 (GB);
E03F5/0407 (EP,GB);
E03F2005/0418 (EP);
F16L19/065 (EP);
F16L25/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENABLAUF MIT GERUCHSVERSCHLUSS | [2016/14] | English: | FLOOR DRAIN WITH SIPHON | [2016/14] | French: | BOUCHE D'ÉGOUT AVEC SIPHON | [2016/14] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 15.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1518969 (BLUECHER METAL APS [DK]) [X] 1-10,13-15 * the whole document * [Y] 11,12; | [XY]EP1806456 (BLUECHER METAL AS [DK]) [X] 1-10,13-15 * the whole document * [Y] 11,12; | [XY]WO2008135704 (DLP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,14,15 * figure 8 * [Y] 4,8-13; | [XY]FR2831570 (WILDKAMP B V [NL]) [X] 1-3,5-7,14,15 * figure 4 * [Y] 4,8-13; | [Y]DE3423600 (SASSERATH & CO KG H [DE]) [Y] 4,8-13 * the whole document * |