Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3002123

EP3002123 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ROTARY THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.05.2018  [2018/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2016/14]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fry, Charles David
99 Barnett Woods Road
New Bloomfield, PA Pennsylvania 17068 / US
02 / Hudson, Richard Earl
503 Indian Rock Circle
Elizabethtown, PA Pennsylvania 17022 / US
 [2016/14]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/14]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date15188226.302.10.2015
[2016/14]
Priority number, dateUS201462059396P03.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462059396 P
US20151487045130.09.2015         Original published format: US201514870451
[2016/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3002123
Date:06.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:B33Y30/00, B29C67/00
[2016/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
Former [2016/14]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DREIDIMENSIONALEN ROLLENDRUCK[2016/14]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ROTARY THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTING[2016/14]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE ROTATIVE[2016/14]
Examination procedure22.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/44]
04.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/22]
09.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/22]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011011818  (ZYDEX PTY LTD [AU]; ELSEY JUSTIN [AU]) [X] 1,4-6,9,10,12,13 * claim - * * figure 16 * [I] 2,3,7,8,11,14,15;
 [X]WO2008077850  (AGFA GRAPHICS NV [BE]; VANMAELE LUC [BE]; DAEMS EDDIE [BE]; DE VOEGHT) [X] 1-15 * claim - * * figure 6 * * page 12, paragraph 0071 - page 15, paragraph 0089 *
 [XI]  - Alexandros Kenich ET AL, "Lathe-Type 3D Printer", (20130604), URL: http://www.scribd.com/doc/147351838/Lathe-Type-3D-Printer#scribd, (20160203), XP055247208 [X] 1-6,8,10,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 7,9,11
by applicantEP1886793
 US6850334
 US6658314
 US6259962
 WO0052624
 WO0076772
 WO0126023
 WO0153105
 WO2004044816
 WO2004050323
 WO2004096514
 WO2004096527
 WO2005053928
 EP1637307
 DE19931112