Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2990004

EP2990004 - BIPOLAR FORCEPS HAVING MONOPOLAR EXTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien AG
Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
[2016/09]
Inventor(s)01 / DUMBAULD, Patrick L.
P.O. Box 2632
Lyons, CO 80540 / US
02 / GARRISON, David M.
2324 Creekside Drive
Longmont, Colorado 80504 / US
03 / GUERRA, Paul
16500 Bonnie Lane
Los Gatos, California 95032 / US
04 / PETERSON, Darion
5428 Glendale Gulch Circle
Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US
05 / DYCUS, Sean T.
Holderbachweg 28
8046 Zurich / CH
 [2016/10]
Representative(s)Morgan, Marc
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[2017/48]
Former [2016/09]Morgan, Marc
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
20 Carlton Crescent
Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB
Application number, filing date15188519.121.10.2005
[2016/09]
Priority number, dateUS2004097030721.10.2004         Original published format: US 970307
[2016/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2990004
Date:02.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2990004
Date:29.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/14
[2016/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2016/39]
Former [2016/09]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IE,  IT 
TitleGerman:BIPOLARE ZANGE MIT MONOPOLARER AUSDEHNUNG[2016/09]
English:BIPOLAR FORCEPS HAVING MONOPOLAR EXTENSION[2016/09]
French:PINCE BIPOLAIRE DOTÉE D'UNE EXTENSION MONOPOLAIRE[2016/09]
Examination procedure23.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/39]
15.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2017Fee for grant paid
12.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05023017.6  / EP1649821
EP10182022.3  / EP2316367
Opposition(s)30.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
06.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
06.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
06.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
06.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
06.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
[2018/41]
Former [2018/23]ES29.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP1530952  (SHERWOOD SERV AG [CH]) [XP] 1-6 * paragraphs [0062] - [0063] - [0071]; figure 2; claims 1,3,7 *;
 [A]US2002099372  (SCHULZE DALE R ET AL) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0057] - [0058]; figure 4 *;
 [A]WO02080799  (SHERWOOD SERV AG [CH]; DYCUS SEAN [US]; SHIELDS CHELSEA [US]; COUTURE) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9966850  (LINA MEDICAL APS; KORNERUP, NIELS) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6033399
 US6187003