Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3006819

EP3006819 - LED LAMP WITH ADJUSTABLE RETAINING ELEMENT AND ASSEMBLY FOR EMITTING LIGHT WITH SUCH A LED LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zumtobel Lighting GmbH
Schweizer Straße 30
6850 Dornbirn / AT
[2016/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Rüf, Wolfgang
Im Porst 17
6850 Dornbirn / AT
02 / Frick, Joachim
Im Tobel 5
6833 Klaus / AT
03 / Kilga, Patrick
Littastrasse 24
6840 Götzis / AT
 [2016/15]
Representative(s)Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2016/15]
Application number, filing date15188707.207.10.2015
[2016/15]
Priority number, dateDE201420104800U07.10.2014         Original published format: DE 202014104800 U
[2016/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3006819
Date:13.04.2016
Language:DE
[2016/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3006819
Date:07.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:F21S8/00, H01R25/14, F21S4/28, F21V21/35, F21V21/02, F21Y115/10, F21Y103/10, F21Y101/00
[2019/41]
Former International [2017/06]F21S8/00, H01R25/14, F21S4/28, F21V21/35, // F21V21/02, F21Y115/10, F21Y103/10, F21Y101/00
Former International [2016/15]F21S8/00, H01R25/14, F21S4/28, F21V21/35, // F21V21/02, F21Y115/10, F21Y103/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/46]
Former [2016/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:LED-LEUCHTE MIT VERSTELLBAREM HALTEELEMENT SOWIE ANORDNUNG ZUR LICHTABGABE MIT EINER SOLCHEN LED-LEUCHTE[2016/15]
English:LED LAMP WITH ADJUSTABLE RETAINING ELEMENT AND ASSEMBLY FOR EMITTING LIGHT WITH SUCH A LED LAMP[2016/15]
French:LAMPE A DEL PRESENTANT UN ELEMENT DE RETENUE REGLABLE ET AGENCEMENT DESTINE A L'EMISSION DE LUMIERE A L'AIDE D'UNE TELLE LAMPE A DEL[2016/15]
Examination procedure30.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/46]
06.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2017Fee for grant paid
25.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.03.2018  07.03.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Hußnätter, Wolfgang
Königstraße 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Königstraße 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
 [2018/16]
23.03.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.07.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.06.2019Date of oral proceedings
26.06.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.06.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition06.09.2019Appeal received No.  T2446/19
05.11.2019Statement of grounds filed
03.09.2019Appeal received No.  T2446/19
21.10.2019Statement of grounds filed
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.10.2015
CY07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
MK07.06.2017
MT07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IE07.10.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU07.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU07.10.2015
CY07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
MT07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IE07.10.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU07.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
Former [2019/31]HU07.10.2015
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
MT07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IE07.10.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU07.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
Former [2018/45]CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
MT07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IE07.10.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU07.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
MT07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU07.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
Former [2018/36]CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU07.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
Former [2018/30]CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/25]CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/52]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/50]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/49]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XDAY]DE102010003805  (ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH [AT]) [XD] 1,3-5,7-9,11-14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0042]; figures 1-8 * [A] 2,6 [Y] 1,3-5,7-14;
 [XAY]DE202012100629U  (ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,11-14 * paragraphs [0022] - [0041]; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,6 [Y] 1,3-5,7-14
by applicantDE102010003805
OppositionDE102010003805
 DE202012100629U
 DE69411904T
 DE10061939
 DE4300402
 DE3214911
 DE2132133