Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3006819 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3006819



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 544
11.11.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.11.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.11.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
21.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.10.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
12.09.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
12.09.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.09.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
09.09.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.09.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
06.09.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.09.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.08.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.06.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.06.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.06.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
26.06.2019 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
26.06.2019 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 13
26.06.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
26.06.2019 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.06.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.06.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.06.2019 Means of redress Opposition 2
26.06.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
26.06.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
26.06.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.06.2019 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.06.2019 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 4
31.05.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 13
24.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.05.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
09.04.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 19
09.04.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
09.04.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 20
04.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
04.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
04.04.2019 Claims Opposition 2
04.04.2019 Claims Opposition 2
04.04.2019 Claims Opposition 2
04.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.04.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
03.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.04.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
02.04.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
27.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.03.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.10.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.10.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.10.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.10.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
26.10.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.10.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.10.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.07.2018 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
23.03.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.03.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.03.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
07.03.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
07.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
07.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
07.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
07.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
07.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
07.03.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
07.06.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.05.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.04.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
25.04.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.04.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
25.04.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
06.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 20
04.01.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
30.09.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
30.09.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
30.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
30.09.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.09.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.04.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.03.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.02.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.02.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 6
03.02.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
03.02.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.01.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 Priority document Search / examination 20
07.10.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
07.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
07.10.2015 Description Search / examination 11
07.10.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Drawings Search / examination 6
07.10.2015 Priority search results Search / examination 8
07.10.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5