Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3006819


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
06.11.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
10.09.2019 New entry: Appeal number
10.09.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
06.09.2019 Change - classification published on  09.10.2019  [2019/41]
06.09.2019 Change - classification published on  09.10.2019  [2019/41]
04.09.2019 Change: Appeal number
03.09.2019 New entry: Appeal number
03.09.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
25.06.2019 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
25.06.2019 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.06.2019 Change - classification published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
21.06.2019 Change - classification published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
03.11.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
13.07.2018 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
23.03.2018 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
16.03.2018 Opposition filed published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
15.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
28.04.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
05.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.01.2017 Change - classification published on  08.02.2017  [2017/06]
06.01.2017 Change - classification published on  08.02.2017  [2017/06]
14.10.2016 Request for examination filed published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
14.10.2016 Change - designated states published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
10.10.2016 Amendment by applicant
12.04.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.04.2016  [2016/15]
07.10.2015 Change - representative