Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3006819
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3006819Global Dossier 07.06.2017B1
EP3006819 13.04.2016A1
Priority number Date
DE202014104800 07.10.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT15351U 15.07.2017U1
Priority number Date
DE202014104800 07.10.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202014104800U 11.01.2016U1
Priority number Date
DE202014104800 07.10.2014