Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3157311

EP3157311 - METHOD OF ASSEMBLING AN ELECTRONIC SUBASSEMBLY FOR A PERSONAL CARE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.10.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
[2018/48]
Former [2017/16]For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Behrendt, Jürgen
Limburger Str. 54
65611 Brechen / DE
02 / Heubach, Klaus
Langhecker Weg 10
65520 Bad Camberg / DE
03 / Scholl, Yvonne
Berta Bagge Straße 50
60438 Frankfurt / DE
04 / Schnak, Fred
Niederhöchstädter Str. 55
61476 Kronberg / DE
 [2017/16]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/48]Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2017/16]Kohol, Sonia
Technical Centres Limited
Procter & Gamble Patent Department
Rusham Park
Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Application number, filing date15190058.615.10.2015
[2017/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3157311
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3157311
Date:28.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/40, B26B21/52, H05K5/00, H05K7/14, H05K13/00, H05K5/06, B26B21/48
[2018/24]
Former International [2017/16]H05K5/06, B26B21/48
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/45]
Former [2017/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN UNTERBAUGRUPPE FÜR EIN KÖRPERPFLEGEPRODUKT[2017/16]
English:METHOD OF ASSEMBLING AN ELECTRONIC SUBASSEMBLY FOR A PERSONAL CARE PRODUCT[2017/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN SOUS-ENSEMBLE ÉLECTRONIQUE DESTINÉ À UN PRODUIT DE SOINS PERSONNELS[2017/16]
Examination procedure15.10.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.10.2017Examination requested  [2017/45]
14.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2018Fee for grant paid
11.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
SI28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/40]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/30]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT28.11.2018
NO28.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]KR20070089345  (JO JOONG BUM [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2009071010  (HART ROBERT ANTHONY [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0033] *