Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3018109

EP3018109 - HYDRAULIC MIXTURE COMPRISING AGGREGATES OF PLANT ORIGIN AND METHOD FOR PREPARING CONCRETE OR MORTAR FROM SAID MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITALCEMENTI S.p.A.
Via G. Camozzi, 124
24121 Bergamo / IT
[2016/19]
Inventor(s)01 / HERVE, Stephen
10 rue de l'Egalité
93140 BONDY / FR
02 / SHINK, Mélanie
13 rue du Général Pershing
78000 VERSAILLES / FR
 [2016/19]
Representative(s)Le Cloirec, Claudine
Ipsilon
3, rue Edouard Nignon
44300 Nantes / FR
[2016/48]
Former [2016/19]Le Cloirec, Claudine
Ipsilon Brema-Loyer
3, rue Edouard Nignon
44300 Nantes / FR
Application number, filing date15191432.226.10.2015
[2016/19]
Priority number, dateFR2014006060404.11.2014         Original published format: FR 1460604
[2016/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3018109
Date:11.05.2016
Language:FR
[2016/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3018109
Date:30.11.2016
Language:FR
[2016/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:C04B28/06
[2016/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/22]
Validation statesMA25.04.2016
TitleGerman:HYDRAULISCHE MISCHUNG, DIE GRANULAT PFLANZLICHEN URSPRUNGS UMFASST, UND BETON- ODER MÖRTELHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN MIT DIESER MISCHUNG[2016/19]
English:HYDRAULIC MIXTURE COMPRISING AGGREGATES OF PLANT ORIGIN AND METHOD FOR PREPARING CONCRETE OR MORTAR FROM SAID MIXTURE[2016/19]
French:MÉLANGE HYDRAULIQUE COMPRENANT DES GRANULATS D'ORIGINE VÉGÉTALE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE BÉTON OU MORTIER À PARTIR DUDIT MÉLANGE[2016/19]
Examination procedure25.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/22]
22.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2016Fee for grant paid
20.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)31.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
MT30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
PT30.03.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/30]EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/52]EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/38]EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/36]EE30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV30.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0703880  (VIMPEX TCD TECH FORSCHUNGSGES [AT]) [AD] 1-19 * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 10 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]FR3004711  (VOGEL STEPHANE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 3 *;
 [A]FR2705336  (SAIS [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9739054  (KHASHOGGI E IND [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 5, line 22 - line 34 * * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 27 * * claims 1,7 *;
 [A]US2553618  (WILLSON CORWIN D) [A] 1 * column 1, line 19 - line 27 * * examples 2,3 * * column 5, line 1 - line 22 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2662156  (STIVAL JACQUES) [A] 1 * page 1, line 25 - line 34 * * claims 1,4,6 *;
 [A]EP2177489  (HOEHN INGE [LU]; HOEHN HERIBERT [LU]) [A] 1 * abstract * * claims 1,3,7,9,11 *;
 [A]DE10046387  (IN TER CONSULT GREIZ INGENIEUR [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * example 3 * * claims 1,3 *;
 [A]EP2154117  (MISCANTHUS NAWARO INNOVATIONS [LU]) [A] 1 * abstract * * claims 1,2,4,7,8 *
by applicantEP1307411
 FR2772745
 FR2927623
 EP0703880