Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3111893

EP3111893 - FEMORAL COMPONENT FOR A KNEE PROSTHESIS WITH IMPROVED ARTICULAR CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK, SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
[2017/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Parisi, Raymond C.
214 Laurelwood Court
Wakarusa, Indiana 46573 / US
02 / Drury, Nick
1812 Pikeview Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
03 / Baldridge, Charles A.
7919 E. 240 S.
Pierceton, Indiana 46562 / US
 [2018/23]
Former [2017/01]01 / Parisi, Raymond C.
214 Laurelwood Court
Wakarusa, IN Indiana 46573 / US
02 / Drury, Nick
1812 Pikeview Drive
Warsaw, IN Indiana 46580 / US
03 / Baldridge, Charles A.
7919 E. 240 S.
Pierceton, IN Indiana 46562 / US
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/01]
Application number, filing date15191778.827.04.2012
[2017/01]
Priority number, dateUS20111316162416.06.2011         Original published format: US201113161624
US201161561658P18.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161561658 P
US201161579873P23.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161579873 P
US201261592575P30.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261592575 P
US201261594113P02.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261594113 P
US201261621370P06.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261621370 P
US201261621372P06.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261621372 P
US201261621373P06.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261621373 P
[2017/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3111893
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3111893
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38
[2017/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/33]
Former [2017/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:FEMURTEIL FÜR EINE KNIEPROTHESE MIT VERBESSERTEN GELENKIGEN EIGENSCHAFTEN[2017/01]
English:FEMORAL COMPONENT FOR A KNEE PROSTHESIS WITH IMPROVED ARTICULAR CHARACTERISTICS[2017/01]
French:COMPOSANT FÉMORAL POUR UNE PROTHÈSE DU GENOU PRÉSENTANT DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES ARTICULAIRES AMÉLIORÉES[2017/01]
Examination procedure27.10.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.03.2016Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
15.04.2016Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
04.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/33]
05.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2018Fee for grant paid
16.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12720354.5  / EP2720647
Opposition(s)07.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/11]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/03]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/52]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/49]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/47]ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
NO06.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004016204  (FOND DE SOUTIEN DE L HOPITAL O [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * page 8, line 17 - line 21 * * page 15, line 15 - page 16, line 27 * * figures 9,10 *;
 [X]US2009319047  (WALKER PETER STANLEY [US]) [X] 1-3,15 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * * figures 1-3,5 *;
 [X]US5609643  (COLLERAN DENNIS P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 34 * * figures 5A,5B *;
 [A]US5035700  (KENNA ROBERT V [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 54 - line 68 * * figure 8 *
by applicantUS5282861
 US2012078263