Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3162241

EP3162241 - OPENING CLASP FOR BRACELET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.08.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Patek Philippe SA Genève
rue du Rhône 41
1204 Genève / CH
[2017/18]
Inventor(s)01 / LE GALL, Eric
24, chemin de Chantemerie
1260 Nyon / CH
02 / NEGATY, Alexandre
Chemin de Saule 85
1233 Bernex / CH
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)Micheli & Cie SA
Rue de Genève 122
Case Postale 61
1226 Genève-Thônex / CH
[2017/18]
Application number, filing date15191840.628.10.2015
[2017/18]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3162241
Date:03.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3162241
Date:04.04.2018
Language:FR
[2018/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:A44C5/24
[2017/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
Former [2017/18]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KLAPPBARER VERSCHLUSS FÜR ARMBAND[2017/18]
English:OPENING CLASP FOR BRACELET[2017/18]
French:FERMOIR DÉPLOYANT POUR BRACELET[2017/18]
Examination procedure28.10.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
02.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2017Fee for grant paid
28.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
LU28.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
[2019/38]
Former [2019/30]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
LU28.10.2018
Former [2019/28]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/12]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL04.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[AD]CH693160  (BOUCLEDOR SA [CH]) [AD] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102010023179  (ALEX WELLENDORFF GMBH & CO KG DR [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]CH708822  (SWATCH GROUP MAN SERV AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]CN202172951U  (QIZONG CHEN) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102013102662  (MOMO PLUS AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantCH693160