Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3015793

EP3015793 - AIR CONDITIONER AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2016/18]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Donghwi
LG Electronics Inc., IP Center
51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
08592 Seoul / KR
02 / PARK, Junseong
LG Electronics Inc., IP Center
51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
08592 Seoul / KR
03 / SHIN, Ilyoong
LG Electronics Inc., IP Center
51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
08592 Seoul / KR
 [2016/18]
Representative(s)Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2018/02]
Former [2016/18]Greenaway, Martin William
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date15191922.228.10.2015
[2016/18]
Priority number, dateKR2014014797629.10.2014         Original published format: KR 20140147976
KR2014014797729.10.2014         Original published format: KR 20140147977
KR2014014797829.10.2014         Original published format: KR 20140147978
[2016/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3015793
Date:04.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3015793
Date:10.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:F25B39/00, F25B49/02, F25B13/00
[2017/19]
Former International [2016/18]F25B13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/50]
Former [2016/18]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KLIMAANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON[2016/18]
English:AIR CONDITIONER AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE SAME[2016/18]
French:CLIMATISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE CORRESPONDANT[2016/18]
Examination procedure28.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/18]
02.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.09.2017Fee for grant paid
25.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.12.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
04.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)11.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
[2019/28]
Former [2019/13]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012118533  (JANG JIYOUNG [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2759785  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2012107775  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *