blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3163012

EP3163012 - SUBSEA COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2019  [2019/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
[2017/35]
Former [2017/18]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Brekke, Endre
Ole Norgaardsveg 27
7049 Trondheim / NO
02 / Furu, Gaute Skjelbred
Frederik Glads Gate 21b
0482 Oslo / NO
03 / Kristiansen, Karstein
Frydenbergvegen 26
7051 Trondheim / NO
04 / Schofield, John Bradford
Dyre Halses gate 7
7042 Trondheim / NO
05 / Volent, Kjetil Zsolt
Vegmesterstien 29B
7022 Trondheim / NO
 [2017/18]
Application number, filing date15192283.830.10.2015
[2017/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3163012
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2016
ClassificationIPC:E21B47/12, H04L29/06
[2017/18]
CPC:
E21B43/01 (EP,US); H04B13/02 (US); H04B10/80 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
Former [2017/18]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNTERSEEKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2017/18]
English:SUBSEA COMMUNICATION DEVICE[2017/18]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SOUS-MARINE[2017/18]
Examination procedure30.10.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
09.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/04]
17.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2004262008  (DEANS GREGOR E [US], et al);
ExaminationEP2523357
 US2014191878
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.