Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3018406

EP3018406 - SOLID FUEL BURNER FOR BURNING AND GASIFYING ANIMAL MANURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.05.2017  [2017/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tapken, Harmanus
Redau 3
26219 Bösel / DE
[2016/19]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2016/19]
Representative(s)Jabbusch, Matthias
Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85
26131 Oldenburg / DE
[2016/19]
Application number, filing date15192790.203.11.2015
[2016/19]
Priority number, dateDE2014101625304.11.2014         Original published format: DE102014016253
[2016/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3018406
Date:11.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:F23B50/02
[2016/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FESTSTOFFBRENNER ZUM VERBRENNEN UND VERGASEN VON TIERISCHEM MIST[2016/19]
English:SOLID FUEL BURNER FOR BURNING AND GASIFYING ANIMAL MANURE[2016/19]
French:BRULEUR A COMBUSTIBLE SOLIDE DESTINE A BRULER ET GAZEIFIER DU LISIER[2016/19]
Examination procedure12.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/20]
23.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/20]
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2385096  (RIVER BASIN ENERGY INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004]; figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] * [I] 5,6;
 [XI]GB2495038  (ELLIOTT ANDREW MARK [GB]) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 2 - line 27; figures 1-5 * * page 5, line 3 - line 14 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 3 * * page 7, line 25 - page 10, line 18 * * page 11, line 12 - line 17 * [I] 5,6;
 [XI]US4145256  (BOWEN MACK D) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 37 - line 68; figures 2-5 * * column 2, line 17 - line 32 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 54 * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 47 * [I] 5,6;
 [A]DE102009003836  (ABELER ALBERT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0015]; figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE102008021314