Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3024306

EP3024306 - HIGH CURRENT CYCLOTRON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ION BEAM APPLICATIONS S.A.
Chemin du Cyclotron, 3
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2016/21]
Inventor(s)01 / FORTON, Eric
Chemin Mahy 110
1457 Nil-Pierreux / BE
02 / KLEEVEN, Willem
Zavelstraat 17
3212 Pellenberg / BE
 [2016/21]
Representative(s)Pecher, Nicolas , et al
Pecher & Partners
Rue Louis de Geer, 6
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2016/21]
Application number, filing date15192905.604.11.2015
[2016/21]
Priority number, dateEP2014019379219.11.2014         Original published format: EP 14193792
[2016/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3024306
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3024306
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:H05H13/00, H05H7/08
[2019/01]
Former International [2016/21]H05H13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/52]
Former [2016/21]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HOCHSTROMZYKLOTRON[2016/21]
English:HIGH CURRENT CYCLOTRON[2016/21]
French:CYCLOTRON A COURANT ELEVE[2016/21]
Examination procedure04.11.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2016Examination requested  [2016/52]
14.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2019Fee for grant paid
25.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP2134145  (ION BEAM APPLIC SA [BE]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0013] , [0031] - [0033] - [0035] * [Y] 3-5 [I] 6-8,11;
 [Y]EP1069809  (ION BEAM APPLIC SA [BE]) [Y] 3-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0055] , [0065] *
by applicantWO0105199
 EP2196073