Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3169069

EP3169069 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMAGING DEVICE INTERFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.05.2018  [2018/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FEI Company
5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive
Hillsboro, OR 97124-5793 / US
[2017/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Potocek, Pavel
Faurestraat 1
5654 PX Eindhoven / NL
02 / Schoenmakers, Remco
Koevelden 17
5685 HE Best / NL
 [2017/20]
Representative(s)Janssen, Francis-Paul
Thermo Fisher Scientific
P.O. Box 1745
5602 BS Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/20]Bakker, Hendrik
FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745
5602 BS Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date15193784.410.11.2015
[2017/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3169069
Date:17.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N17/00
[2017/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR ABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNGSSCHNITTSTELLEN[2017/20]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMAGING DEVICE INTERFACES[2017/20]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'INTERFACES DE DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE[2017/20]
Examination procedure18.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/20]
03.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]EP0977431  (CANON KK [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0142]; figures 24,25 *;
 [A]US2003187603  (BACHMANN JAMES THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2009094053  (JUNG EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0127] *