Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3021421

EP3021421 - CONNECTION DEVICE FOR MULTI-CONDUCTOR CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2016/20]
Inventor(s)01 / OESTERHAUS, Jens
Am Höwel 4
32760 Detmold / DE
02 / DIEKMANN, Torsten
Rebhuhnweg 4
33618 Leopoldshöhe / DE
03 / MEIER, Jan
Hohe Str. 2
32756 Detmold / DE
 [2016/20]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2016/20]
Application number, filing date15194162.211.11.2015
[2016/20]
Priority number, dateDE20141011649012.11.2014         Original published format: DE102014116490
[2016/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3021421
Date:18.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/24, H01R12/67, H01R43/01
[2016/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/41]
Former [2016/20]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MEHRLEITERKABEL[2016/20]
English:CONNECTION DEVICE FOR MULTI-CONDUCTOR CABLES[2016/20]
French:DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT POUR CABLE MULTICONDUCTEUR[2016/20]
Examination procedure02.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/41]
17.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO9601510  (MAGNIER BERNARD [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10,13 * the whole document * [Y] 11,14,15,17-20,22,23 [I] 7;
 [X]US5704801  (WALKER ROBERT WAYNE [US], et al) [X] 1,4,12,16,21 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1764870  (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [Y] 14,15,20,22,23 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1-10 *;
 [Y]DE202006019520U  (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [Y] 11,17,18 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]DE2355774  (AMP INC) [Y] 19 * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 6 * * figures 1, 4 *
by applicantDE3422607
 EP1518812
 EP1936747