Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3035752

EP3035752 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING COMMUNICATION SERVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2016/25]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / JEONG, Wook-Hyun
No 5409-401, 65, Docheong-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / KIM, Sang-Mook
No 107-2001, 311, Anyangcheonseo-ro
Manan-gu
Anyang-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / YOU, Jin-Woo
No 103-503, 25, Dongpangyo-ro 177beon-gil
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2016/25]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/25]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15194561.513.11.2015
[2016/25]
Priority number, dateKR2014018161916.12.2014         Original published format: KR 20140181619
[2016/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3035752
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W68/00, H04W88/06
[2016/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON KOMMUNIKATIONSDIENSTEN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2016/25]
English:METHOD FOR PROVIDING COMMUNICATION SERVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE THEREOF[2016/25]
French:DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE ET PROCEDE POUR FOURNIR UN SERVICE DE COMMUNICATION[2016/25]
Examination procedure13.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/25]
09.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2605562  (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0045] , [0047] , [0057] - [0062] - [0103]; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]WO2009105676  (DIVITAS NETWORKS INC [US]; MITTAL AJAY [US]; RAO PRASAD [US]; ATHULURU) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] - [0018] - [0133] - [0139] , [0142] , [0170] , [0315]; figures 1-5c,14sa-16b,19,28,28,29,45 *;
 [X]EP2403298  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0004] - [0015] - [0034] - [0053]; figures 1-7 *