Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3064787

EP3064787 - SELF-TAPPING SCREW AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Crown Screw Corporation
4-7-31 Kamimuneoka Shiki-shi
Saitama 353-0001 / JP
[2016/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Ogawa, Nobuhiro
C/O Crown Screw Corporation
4-7-31, Kamimuneoka
Shiki-shi
Saitama / JP
02 / Yokoyama, Naoki
C/O Crown Screw Corporation
4-7-31, Kamimuneoka
Shiki-shi
Saitama / JP
 [2016/36]
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[2019/16]
Former [2016/36]Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Application number, filing date15194574.813.11.2015
[2016/36]
Priority number, dateJP2015004029802.03.2015         Original published format: JP 2015040298
[2016/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3064787
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3064787
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16B25/00
[2016/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
Former [2016/36]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SELBSTSCHNEIDENDE SCHRAUBE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2016/36]
English:SELF-TAPPING SCREW AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2016/36]
French:VIS AUTOTARAUDEUSE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2016/36]
Examination procedure13.11.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/13]
14.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2019Fee for grant paid
05.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.04.2019
ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
HR17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
LV17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
PL17.04.2019
RS17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
BG17.07.2019
NO17.07.2019
GR18.07.2019
IS17.08.2019
PT17.08.2019
[2020/04]
Former [2019/52]AL17.04.2019
ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
HR17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
LV17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
PL17.04.2019
RS17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
BG17.07.2019
NO17.07.2019
GR18.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
Former [2019/51]AL17.04.2019
ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
HR17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
LV17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
RS17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
BG17.07.2019
NO17.07.2019
GR18.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
Former [2019/50]AL17.04.2019
ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
HR17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
LV17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
RS17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
GR18.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
Former [2019/49]AL17.04.2019
ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
HR17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
Former [2019/48]ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
Former [2019/47]ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
Former [2019/44]NL17.04.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2011153619  (GRK CANADA LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 4, paragraph 1; figure - *;
 [X]WO8000425  (VELDMAN D) [X] 1-4 * page 15, lines 5-35; figure - *;
 [X]JP3020904B  (CROWN SEIMITSU KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * figure - *;
 [X]US5088869  (GREENSLADE JOE E [US]) [X] 1,3 * figure - *;
 [X]US3520343  (EVANS EDWIN R) [X] 1 * figure - *;
 [X]GB943575  (GEN AM TRANSPORT) [X] 1 * figure - *
by applicantJP3338649B