blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3024207

EP3024207 - MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL FOR REPRODUCING MUSIC FILE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.09.2020
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.10.2020  [2020/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2019/46]
Former [2016/21]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lim, Kyoung-Ae
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.,
416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Gyeonggi-do
Suwon-si / KR
02 / Choi, Seung-Chul
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.,
416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Gyeonggi-do
Suwon-si / KR
03 / Jong-Sub, Lee
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.,
416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Gyeonggi-do
Suwon-si / KR
04 / Lee, Kyoung-Shin
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.,
416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Gyeonggi-do
Suwon-si / KR
 [2016/21]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2016/21]
Application number, filing date15194602.730.03.2006
[2016/21]
Priority number, dateKR2005002753301.04.2005         Original published format: KR 20050027533
KR2006002090006.03.2006         Original published format: KR 20060020900
[2016/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3024207
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3024207
Date:13.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2016
ClassificationIPC:H04M1/725, H04M1/60
[2016/21]
CPC:
H04M1/6058 (EP,KR,US); H04M1/72442 (EP,KR,US); H04M1/05 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/6041 (KR,US); H04M1/6066 (EP); H04M1/72403 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72409 (EP,KR,US); H04M1/72412 (EP,KR,US); H04M19/047 (KR,US);
H04S1/007 (KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2016/21]
TitleGerman:MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT ZUR WIEDERGABE VON MUSIKDATEIEN[2016/21]
English:MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL FOR REPRODUCING MUSIC FILE[2016/21]
French:TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE DE REPRODUCTION DES FICHIERS MUSICAUX[2016/21]
Examination procedure13.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/21]
21.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2019Fee for grant paid
04.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06006766.7  / EP1722542
EP12160368.2  / EP2469819
Divisional application(s)EP19202368.7  / EP3661179
Opposition(s)14.08.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
13.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
13.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
13.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
13.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1128643  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0059]; figures 11,12 *;
 [I]EP1179944  (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014]; figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0022] , [0026] - paragraph [0036]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] , [0066] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0077]; figures 6,7 * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0125]; figures 15,16 *;
 [A]EP1265422  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US2003162571  (CHUNG JE-HWAN [KR]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0015] ** paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025]; figure - *;
 [A]EP1404026  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057]; figure 8 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0084]; figure 14 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.