Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3032366

EP3032366 - AUTOMATION DEVICE, CONNECTION MODULE FOR AN AUTOMATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN AUTOMATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2016/24]
Inventor(s)01 / ROSE, Gorm
Sellinghusener Str. 13
33100 Paderborn / DE
02 / STRÜNKMANN, Marc
Zum Kampe 9
33104 Paderborn / DE
03 / KULTURIDI, Georg
Stettinerstr. 6
33605 Bielefeld / DE
 [2016/24]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/24]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date15194683.716.11.2015
[2016/24]
Priority number, dateDE20141011838911.12.2014         Original published format: DE102014118389
[2016/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3032366
Date:15.06.2016
Language:DE
[2016/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/05
[2016/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/04]
Former [2016/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISIERUNGSGERÄT, ANSCHLUSSMODUL FÜR EIN AUTOMATISIERUNGSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES AUTOMATISIERUNGSGERÄTS[2016/24]
English:AUTOMATION DEVICE, CONNECTION MODULE FOR AN AUTOMATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN AUTOMATION DEVICE[2016/24]
French:APPAREIL D'AUTOMATISATION, MODULE DE RACCORDEMENT POUR UN APPAREIL D'AUTOMATISATION ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN APPAREIL D'AUTOMATISATION[2016/24]
Examination procedure16.11.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/04]
24.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
03.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
03.04.2017Request for further processing filed
03.04.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.04.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2605092  (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0099] * * figures 1,7a-7d *;
 [XP]EP2899640  (CONTROL TECH LTD [GB]) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102004056363