Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3023140

EP3023140 - FORMATION AND CONTROL OF FLUIDIC SPECIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
[2019/41]
Former [2016/21]For all designated states
President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LINK, Darren R.
44 Hartwell Avenue
Lexington, MA Massachusetts 02421 / US
02 / WEITZ, David A.
213 Green Road
Bolton, MA Massachusetts 01740 / US
03 / MARQUEZ-SANCHEZ, Manuel
14 Sheffield Court
Lincolnshire, IL Illinois 60069 / US
04 / CHENG, Zhengdong
215 Highland Avenue
Quincy, MA Massachusetts 02170 / US
 [2016/24]
Representative(s)McNamara, Kathryn
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
[2019/41]
Former [2016/21]Cowley, Catherine Mary , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date15194786.809.04.2004
[2016/21]
Priority number, dateUS20030461954P10.04.2003         Original published format: US 461954 P
[2016/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3023140
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3023140
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:B01F13/00, B01F5/06, B01J2/04, B05B7/06, B05B5/025
[2016/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/01]
Former [2016/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ERZEUGUNG UND KONTROLLE VON FLUIDEN[2016/21]
English:FORMATION AND CONTROL OF FLUIDIC SPECIES[2016/21]
French:FORMATION ET RÉGULATION D'ESPÈCES FLUIDIQUES[2016/21]
Examination procedure16.11.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/01]
22.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2017Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
19.12.2017Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
08.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2019Fee for grant paid
28.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04759306.6  / EP1610888
EP08165420.4  / EP2127736
Divisional application(s)EP19196999.7
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
22.12.2016Request for further processing filed
22.12.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.05.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0076673  (ARADIGM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 27 - line 18 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]DE10015109  (WALZEL PETER [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 6 - line 21 * * figures 1,3 *
by applicantWO0189788
 US5512131
 WO9629629
 US6355198
 WO0247665
 WO03011443
 WO2004002627
    - GANAN-CALVO ET AL., "Generation of Steady Liquid Microthreads and Micron-Sized Monodispersed Sprays and Gas Streams", PHYS. REV. LETT., (19980112), vol. 80, page 2
    - ANGELL ET AL., SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (1983), vol. 248, pages 44 - 55
    - DUFFY ET AL., "Rapid Prototyping ofMicrofluidic Systems and Polydimethylsiloxane", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 70, pages 474 - 480
 US20030461954
 US20030498091