Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3002902

EP3002902 - SIGNATURE MANAGEMENT FOR THE UPLINK RANDOM ACCESS CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[2016/14]
Inventor(s)01 / KATO, Yasuyuki
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / YAMADA, Shohei
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
03 / OH, Wahoh
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
 [2016/14]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2016/14]
Application number, filing date15195423.728.09.2007
[2016/14]
Priority number, dateJP2006029677731.10.2006         Original published format: JP 2006296777
[2016/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3002902
Date:06.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00
[2016/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/39]
Former [2016/14]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SIGNATURVERWALTUNG FÜR DEN UPLINK-DIREKTZUGRIFFSKANAL[2016/14]
English:SIGNATURE MANAGEMENT FOR THE UPLINK RANDOM ACCESS CHANNEL[2016/14]
French:GESTION DE SIGNATURE POUR LE CANAL D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE DE LIAISON MONTANTE[2016/14]
Examination procedure16.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/39]
30.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07828705.9  / EP2083580
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2006096421  (NAVINI NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-3 * claims 1-8 *;
 [I]  - MOTOROLA, "RACH Design for EUTRA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-060025, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060119), vol. RAN WG1, no. Helsinki, Finland; 20060119, XP050111168 [I] 1-3 * Section 3 *
 [A]  - NOKIA, "Procedure for non-synchronized random access", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-062822, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20061004), vol. RAN WG1, no. Seoul, Korea; 20061004, XP050103307 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *