Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3171137

EP3171137 - ROTARY ENCODER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baumer Hübner GmbH
Max-Dohrn-Strasse 2+4
10589 Berlin / DE
[2017/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Hiller, Herr Bernhard
Baumer Hübner GmbH
Gollanczstrasse 113
13465 Berlin / DE
02 / Hanke, Martin
Baumer Hübner GmbH
Dolgenseestr. 43
10319 Berlin / DE
 [2017/21]
Representative(s)Strauss, Steffen
Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 Group Intellectual Property
8501 Frauenfeld / CH
[2017/21]
Application number, filing date15195928.523.11.2015
[2017/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3171137
Date:24.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3171137
Date:04.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/14, G01D5/12
[2018/03]
Former International [2017/21]G01D5/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/01]
Former [2017/21]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:DREHGEBERANORDNUNG[2017/21]
English:ROTARY ENCODER ASSEMBLY[2017/21]
French:SYSTÈME D'ENCODEUR[2017/21]
Examination procedure23.11.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/01]
04.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2018Fee for grant paid
19.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
LU23.11.2018
[2019/34]
Former [2019/33]AL04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AL04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL04.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]DE60100635T  (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] - [0050] , [0057]; figure 6; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]WO03098147  (AMERICAN ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0025] , [0026] , [0029] , [0030]; figures 1a,1d *;
 [A]WO2014135453  (MEHNERT WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 8, paragraphs 6,7; figure 1 * * page 10, paragraph 3; claim 8 *