Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3173507

EP3173507 - METHOD FOR THE ORGANOMETALLIC GAS PHASE DEPOSITION UNDER USE OF SOLUTIONS OF INDIUMALKYL COMPOUNDS IN HYDROCARBONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.05.2018  [2018/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Umicore AG & Co. KG
Rodenbacher Chaussee 4
63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE
[2017/22]
Inventor(s)01 / KOCH, Joerg
Vor dem Stoeffel 21
35232 Dautphetal / DE
02 / BRIEL, Oliver
Bahnhofstrasse 54
63755 Alzenau / DE
 [2017/22]
Application number, filing date15196340.225.11.2015
[2017/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3173507
Date:31.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/448, C23C16/30, C23C16/40, C30B25/02, C07F5/00, C30B23/06
[2017/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR METALLORGANISCHEN GASPHASENABSCHEIDUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LÖSUNGEN VON INDIUMALKYLVERBINDUNGEN IN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN[2017/22]
English:METHOD FOR THE ORGANOMETALLIC GAS PHASE DEPOSITION UNDER USE OF SOLUTIONS OF INDIUMALKYL COMPOUNDS IN HYDROCARBONS[2017/22]
French:PROCEDE DE DEPOT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR ORGANOMETALLIQUE A L'AIDE DE SOLUTIONS DE COMPOSES D'INDIUM(ALKYL) DANS DES HYDROCARBURES[2017/22]
Examination procedure01.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/22]
15.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/22]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]CA668724  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 13 * page 11, line 8 - line 15; example 17 *;
 [X]JP2011196956  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0019] , [0035] *;
 [X]US2006226075  (SHENAI-KHATKHATE DEODATTA V [US], et al) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0029] , [0013]; example 2 *;
 [X]US5300320  (BARRON ANDREW R [US], et al) [X] 13 * example 2 *;
 [X]JP2010001247  (UBE INDUSTRIES) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0014] *;
 [X]US2011045166  (SHIMMURA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0040] , [0045]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2013220221  (SANCHEZ ERROL ANTONIO C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0030] *;
 [A]US2014141170  (ORITA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0062] - [0064] *
by applicantDE102013225632
 US6284042
    - J. ZILKO VERWIESEN, Handbook of Thin Film Deposition - Processes and Technologies, (2001), pages 151 - 203,
    - FANNIN ET AL., "Constant indium delivery from trimethylindium-hexadecane slurry", J. ELECTRON. MAT., (1994), vol. 23, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1007/BF02655252, pages 93 - 96, XP035178280

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02655252
    - GERALD B., Organometallic Vapor-Phase Epitaxy: Theory and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1989),