Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3026905

EP3026905 - DISTANCE ADAPTIVE DISPLAYING METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON EYEBALL TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shenzhen Magic Eye Technology Co., Ltd
Room 809, Wing A,8/F, GDC Building
No. 9 Gaoxinzhong 3rd Ave.
Nanshan
Shenzhen
Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2017/07]
Former [2016/22]For all designated states
Shenzhen Estar Technology Group Co., Ltd
Room 806, Wing A, 8/F
GDC Building
n° 9 Goaxinzhong 3rd Avenue
Nanshan, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Meihong
Room 806, Wing A, 8/F, GDC Building, n° 9
Goaxinzhong 3rd Avenue, Nanshan
518057 Shenzhen / CN
02 / GAO, Wei
Room 806, Wing A, 8/F, GDC Building, n° 9
Goaxinzhong 3rd Avenue, Nanshan
518057 Shenzhen / CN
03 / XU, Wanliang
Room 806, Wing A, 8/F, GDC Building, n° 9
Goaxinzhong 3rd Avenue, Nanshan
518057 Shenzhen / CN
 [2016/22]
Representative(s)Office Kirkpatrick
Avenue Wolfers, 32
1310 La Hulpe / BE
[2016/22]
Application number, filing date15196833.627.11.2015
[2016/22]
Priority number, dateCN20141071242228.11.2014         Original published format: CN201410712422
[2016/22]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3026905
Date:01.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/00, H04N13/04
[2016/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/01]
Former [2016/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DISTANZADAPTIVES ANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG AUF BASIS VON AUGAPFELVERFOLGUNG[2016/22]
English:DISTANCE ADAPTIVE DISPLAYING METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON EYEBALL TRACKING[2016/22]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE ADAPTATIF À DISTANCE ET DISPOSITIF BASÉ SUR LA POURSUITE DU GLOBE OCULAIRE[2016/22]
Examination procedure27.11.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/01]
24.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2018
17.09.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/06]
30.09.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2013107467  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE]; LINGE ANDERS [SE]; EK MARTIN [SE];) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 15 - line 29 * * page 4, line 24 * * page 12, line 13 - line 16 * * page 14, line 1 - line 25; figures 2-4 *;
 [Y]US5579026  (TABATA SEIICHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1,6 * page 12, line 47 - line 56 *;
 [Y]US2010253766  (MANN SAMUEL A [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0026] , [0051] - [0053] - [0057] *