Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3041275

EP3041275 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ACTIVATING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION FUNCTION AUTOMATICALLY FOR GEO-FENCE, SYSTEM COMPRISING THE SAME AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM HAVING COMPUTER PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SK Planet Co., Ltd.
Sampyeong-dong
264 Pangyo-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-400 / KR
[2019/26]
Former [2016/27]For all designated states
SK Planet Co., Ltd.
Sampyeong-dong
264 Pangyo-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-400 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / JEON, Seul Ma Ro
(Ateunville Apt., Hadaewon-dong) 1017-502
300, Dunchon-daero
Jungwon-gu
Seongnam-si
462-711, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / JEONG, Eun Su
(Jugong Apt., Burim-dong) 808-806
180, Byeoryang-ro
Gwacheon-si
427-735, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2016/27]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[2019/26]
Former [2016/27]Thorniley, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date15197138.930.11.2015
[2016/27]
Priority number, dateKR2015000060705.01.2015         Original published format: KR 20150000607
[2016/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3041275
Date:06.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3041275
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/021, H04W4/50, // H04W4/80
[2019/04]
Former International [2016/27]H04W4/02, H04W4/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/08]
Former [2016/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN AKTIVIERUNG VON DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSFUNKTIONEN IN GEO-FENCE, SYSTEM UND NICHT VERGÄNGLICHES COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM MIT DARAUF AUFGEZEICHNETEM COMPUTERPROGRAMM[2016/27]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ACTIVATING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION FUNCTION AUTOMATICALLY FOR GEO-FENCE, SYSTEM COMPRISING THE SAME AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM HAVING COMPUTER PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON[2016/27]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ACTIVATION AUTOMATIQUE DE FONCTION DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL POUR GARDIENNAGE VIRTUEL, SYSTÈME COMPRENANT CET APPAREIL ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR NON TRANSITOIRE SUR LEQUEL EST ENREGISTRÉ UN PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE[2016/27]
Examination procedure30.11.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/08]
10.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2019Fee for grant paid
16.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]US2013072226  (THRAMANN JEFF [US]) [X] 1-13 * figures 1,2,5 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] *;
 [X]WO2013056145  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0054] *