EP3029722 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUTTING WORKPIECES MADE OF HARD BRITTLE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Bergakademie Freiberg Akademiestr 6 09596 Freiberg / DE | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMS, Alfons Zum Waldblick 30 09633 Halsbrücke / DE | 02 /
KRÜGER, Thomas Oststraße 15 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 15197210.6 | 01.12.2015 | [2016/23] | Priority number, date | DE201410224902 | 04.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014224902 | [2016/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3029722 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/67, B23D57/00 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
H01L21/67092 (EP);
B23D57/0046 (EP);
B28D5/0082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2016/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRENNEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN AUS SPRÖDHARTEN WERKSTOFFEN | [2016/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUTTING WORKPIECES MADE OF HARD BRITTLE MATERIALS | [2016/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SEPARATION DE PIECES EN MATIERES DURES ET CASSANTES | [2016/23] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 08.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 27.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003145707 (HAUSER CHARLES [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0064] * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]CN104129001 (JIANGXI SAIWEI LDK SOLAR ENERGY HIGH TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * |