Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3175942 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3175942



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 151
15.02.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
23.04.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
15.03.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.12.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
27.12.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.12.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
25.10.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.09.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
19.09.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.09.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.09.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
19.09.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
17.08.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.08.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
10.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
10.08.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.07.2017 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.06.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.05.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.12.2016 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
05.12.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.11.2016 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
15.11.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
14.10.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.07.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
04.07.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 12
17.05.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.05.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 1
17.05.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
17.05.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
03.05.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
01.12.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
01.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 6
01.12.2015 Description Search / examination 12
01.12.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.12.2015 Drawings Search / examination 6
01.12.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5