Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3175942


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019 [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
15.02.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
09.03.2018 (Expected) grant published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
08.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.01.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
30.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
30.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.09.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.08.2017 Amendment by applicant
28.07.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
28.07.2017 Request for examination filed published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
28.07.2017 Change - designated states published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
15.06.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
30.11.2016 Change - representative
12.07.2016 Amendment by applicant
01.12.2015 Change - representative