Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3040089

EP3040089 - IMPROVED PHARMACEUTICAL-COATED MEDICAL PRODUCTS AND THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Invatec Technology Center GmbH
Hungerbüelstrasse 12A
8500 Frauenfeld / CH
[2016/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Scheller, Bruno
c/o Saarland University Hospital
66421 Homburg / DE
02 / Speck, Ulrich
Institut für Radiologie Charite Chariteplatz 1
10098 Berlin / DE
 [2016/27]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Josephspitalstr. 15
80331 München / DE
[2016/27]
Application number, filing date15197319.501.08.2008
[2016/27]
Priority number, dateDE2007103668503.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007036685
[2016/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3040089
Date:06.07.2016
Language:DE
[2016/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61L29/16, A61L29/08
[2016/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/02]
Former [2016/27]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE ARZNEIMITTELBESCHICHTETE MEDIZINPRODUKTE UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2016/27]
English:IMPROVED PHARMACEUTICAL-COATED MEDICAL PRODUCTS AND THE PRODUCTION THEREOF[2016/27]
French:PRODUITS MÉDICAUX AMÉLIORÉS AVEC REVÊTEMENT MÉDICAMENTEUX ET LEUR FABRICATION[2016/27]
Examination procedure01.12.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/02]
09.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08801121.8  / EP2170421
EP13181006.1  / EP2682138
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
01.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
01.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
23.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO02070022  (DITIZIO VALERIO [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,9-11,15 * claim - * [I] 4,8,12-14;
 [X]WO2004014453  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-3,9,15 * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 3 * * claim - *;
 [X]WO2004014450  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,15 * page 12, line 16 - page 13, line 15 * * claim - *;
 [E]WO2009015476  (COVALON TECHNOLOGIES LTD [CA], et al) [E] 1,3,5-7,9,11,15 * claim - *
by applicantEP1372737
 WO2004028582
 WO02076509
 US2006034947
 WO03099346
 EP0519063
 US5102402
 DE102004046244
 WO2004022124
 WO2007090385
 US2008118544
 WO9211890
 WO2004006976
 WO0021584
 US2003064965
 US2006002973
 DE102004048265
 US2004224003
 WO03039612
 WO9639949
 WO2005089855
 US2005033417
 WO0152772
 US6306166
    - SCHILLINGER M; SABETI S; LOEWE C ET AL., "Balloon angioplasty versus implantation of nitinol stents in the superficial femoral artery", J N ENGL J MED, (2006), vol. 354, pages 1879 - 88
    - YANG W; GE J; LIU H ET AL., CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 72, pages 483 - 493
    - SCHELLER B; HEHRLEIN C; BOCKSCH W; RUTSCH W; HAGHI D; DIETZ U; BÖHM M; SPECK U, "Treatment of Coronary In-stent Restenosis with a Paclitaxel-coated Balloon Catheter", N ENGL J MED, (2006), vol. 255, pages 2113 - 2124
    - TEPE G; ZELLER T; ALBRECHT T; HELLERS; SCHWARZWÄLDER U; BEREGI J-P; CLAUSSEN CD; OLDENBURG A; SCHELLER B; SPECK U, "Local delivery of paclitaxel to inhibit restenosis during angioplasty of the leg", NEW ENGL J MED, (2008), vol. 358, pages 689 - 699
    - SCHELLER B; SPECK U; BÖHM M, "Prevention of restenosis - is angioplasty the answer?", HEART, (2007), vol. 93, pages 539 - 541
    - SCHELLER B; SPECK U; ABRAMJUK C; BERNHARDT U; BÖHM M; NICKENIG G, "Paclitaxel balloon coating - a novel method for prevention and therapy of restenosis", CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 110, doi:doi:10.1161/01.CIR.0000138929.71660.E0, pages 810 - 814, XP002614503

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000138929.71660.E0
    - CREMERS B; BIEDERMANN M; MAHNKOPF D; BÖHM M; SCHELLER B., "Paclitaxel-beschichtete PTCA-Katheter: Gibt es Unterschiede? Einfluss von PACCOCATH®- und D!OR@-Ba!!onkathetern auf die Neointimaproliferation an Schweinekoronarien", CLIN RES CARDIOL, (2008), vol. 97, no. 1, page V1742
    - LEVIN AD; VUKMIROVIC N; HWANG C-W; EDELMAN ER, "Specific binding to intracellular proteins determines arterial transport properties for rapamycin and paclitaxel", PNAS, (2004), vol. 101, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0400918101, pages 9463 - 9467, XP002532740

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0400918101
    - MUNI NI ET AL., AM HEART J, (2005), vol. 149, pages 415 - 433
    - KIESZ RS ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 103, pages 26 - 31
    - KUTRYK MJB ET AL., J AM COLI CARDIOL, (2002), vol. 39, pages 281 - 7
    - HUANG ET AL., AM J CARDIOL
    - HAYAKAWA E; FURUYA K; KURODA T; MORIYAMA M; KONDO A, "Viscosity study on the self-association of doxorubicin in aqueous solution", CHEM. PHARM BULL, (1991), vol. 39, pages 1282 - 1286, XP002523926
    - SCHELLER B; SPECK U; ABRAMJUK C; BERNHARDT U; BÖHM M; NICKENIG G, "Paclitaxel balloon coating - a novel method for prevention and therapy of restenosis", CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 110, doi:doi:10.1161/01.CIR.0000138929.71660.E0, pages 810 - 4, XP002614503

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000138929.71660.E0