Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3034057

EP3034057 - PATIENT SUPPORT APPARATUS WITH HYDRAULIC CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, CZ, EE, RO, SK
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stryker Corporation
2825 Airview Boulevard
Kalamazoo, MI 49002 / US
[2016/25]
Inventor(s)01 / PATMORE, Kevin Mark
10925 N. 19th Street
Plainwell, MI 49080 / US
02 / BARTLEY, Gary L.
3817 Stonegate Road
Kalamazoo, MI 49004 / US
 [2016/25]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[2019/05]
Former [2016/25]Coyle, Philip Aidan
F. R. Kelly & Co.
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date15199528.911.12.2015
[2016/25]
Priority number, dateUS201462094315P19.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462094315 P
[2016/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3034057
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3034057
Date:30.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61G7/05, A61G7/018
[2016/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/04]
Former [2016/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:PATIENTENLIEGEVORRICHTUNG MIT HYDRAULISCHEM STEUERSYSTEM[2016/25]
English:PATIENT SUPPORT APPARATUS WITH HYDRAULIC CONTROL SYSTEM[2016/25]
French:APPAREIL DE SUPPORT POUR PATIENT AVEC SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE[2016/25]
Examination procedure11.12.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/04]
13.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2018Fee for grant paid
28.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL30.01.2019
CZ30.01.2019
DK30.01.2019
EE30.01.2019
ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
IT30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RO30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
SK30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
[2019/49]
Former [2019/48]DK30.01.2019
ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
IT30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/46]ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
IT30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO0066394  (BRAUN CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10,12,13 * figure - * * page 6 - page 14 * [I] 3-5,8,11,14,15;
 [XI]DE4301547  (KNAPP MIKROHYDRAULIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-13 * figure - * * column 3 - column 8 * [I] 3-5,8,14,15;
 [XI]WO2014089180  (FERNO WASHINGTON [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-13 * figure - * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0092] * [I] 3-5,8,14,15;
 [XI]WO2006036980  (STRYKER CORP [US]; LAMBARTH CLIFFORD E [US]; SOUKE CHAD [US]; GATTO TO) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10,12,13 * figure - * * the whole document * [I] 3-5,8,11,14,15;
 [XI]WO2009116859  (ACTUANT CORP [US]; BEUMER JAN ALBERTUS [NL]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10,12,13 * page 8 - page 19 * [I] 3-5,8,11,14,15