Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3032288

EP3032288 - ALIGNMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTAINER OR VEHICLE INSPECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tsinghua University
No. 1 Tsinghua Yuan
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
For all designated states
Nuctech Company Limited
2nd Floor, Block A
TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2016/24]For all designated states
Tsinghua University
No. 1 Tsinghua Yuan
Haidian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
For all designated states
Nuctech Company Limited
2nd Fl. Block A Tongfang Building
Shuangqinglu
Hadian District
Beijing 100084 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Jianmin
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
02 / LI, Yulan
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
03 / LI, Yuanjing
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
04 / YU, Hao
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
05 / ZONG, Chunguang
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
06 / GU, Jingyu
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
07 / YU, Weifeng
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
08 / SONG, Quanwei
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
09 / WANG, Weizhen
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
10 / SUN, Shangmin
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
11 / LIU, Yinong
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
12 / LI, Junli
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
13 / TANG, Chuanxiang
2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building
Shuangqinglu, Haidian District
100084 Beijing / CN
 [2016/24]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/24]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date15199611.311.12.2015
[2016/24]
Priority number, dateCN20141076754411.12.2014         Original published format: CN201410767544
[2016/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3032288
Date:15.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01V5/00
[2016/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSRICHTUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN CONTAINER- ODER FAHRZEUGINSPEKTIONSSYSTEM[2016/24]
English:ALIGNMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTAINER OR VEHICLE INSPECTION SYSTEM[2016/24]
French:SYSTÈME D'ALIGNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CONTENEUR OU SYSTÈME D'INSPECTION DE VÉHICULE[2016/24]
Examination procedure29.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/24]
08.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2009086907  (SMITH STEVEN WINN [US]) [X] 1,3,6-9 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0020] - [0021] * [Y] 5 [I] 2,4;
 [XYI]US2011274242  (LINEV VLADIMIR N [BY]) [X] 1,3,6-9 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0041] , [0 45] - [0048] * [Y] 5 [I] 2,4;
 [I]CN103185891  (NUCTECH CO LTD) [I] 1,3,6,8,9 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] *;
 [X]US2014192958  (DINCA DAN-CRISTIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6-9 * figures 10A, 10B, 11 * * paragraphs [0091] - [0093] *;
 [X]US2014321588  (GOZANI TSAHI [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7-9 * figures 1, 6, 7A, 7B * * paragraphs [0120] - [0122] *