EP3182721 - CONTROLLING OWN-VOICE EXPERIENCE OF TALKER WITH OCCLUDED EAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications, Inc. 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISBERG, Peter Iliongränd 233 22472 Lund / SE | 02 /
PETEF, Andrej Midgårdsgatan 19 22474 Lund / SE | 03 /
MOLINER, Olivier Pedellgatan 1R 22460 Lund / SE | 04 /
THÖRN, Ola Tegnergatan 15 21612 Limhamn / SE | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Neij & Lindberg AB Pedellgatan 11 224 60 Lund / SE | [2017/25] | Application number, filing date | 15200130.1 | 15.12.2015 | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182721 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, H04R25/00 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
H04R1/1091 (EP,US);
H04R1/1016 (CN,US);
H04R29/001 (US);
G06F3/162 (US);
H04R25/50 (CN);
G10L25/84 (US);
H04R1/1083 (US);
H04R2201/10 (CN);
H04R2201/107 (US);
H04R2225/43 (CN);
H04R2460/01 (EP,US);
H04R2460/05 (EP,US);
H04R25/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] |
Former [2017/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DER ERFAHRUNG DER EIGENEN SPRACHE EINES REDNERS MIT OKKLUDIERTEM OHR | [2017/25] | English: | CONTROLLING OWN-VOICE EXPERIENCE OF TALKER WITH OCCLUDED EAR | [2017/25] | French: | CONTRÔLE D'EXPÉRIENCE OWN-VOICE DE LOCUTEUR AVEC OREILLE OCCULTÉE | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/09] | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2004021740 (OTICON AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-14 * figures 1-3 * * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 30 * [Y] 6,11 [I] 15; | [XYI]US2009310805 (PETROFF MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-14 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0056] * * claim 2 * [Y] 6,11 [I] 15; | [Y]WO2014194932 (PHONAK AG [CH]) [Y] 11 * page 1, line 6 - line 11 * * page 12, line 17 - line 24 * * page 22, line 7 - line 14 *; | [XY]WO2014198307 (PHONAK AG [CH]) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 6 *[Y] 6 | by applicant | - KIESSLING ET AL., "Occlusion effect of earmolds with different venting systems", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF AUDIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 16, pages 237 - 249 |