Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3108753

EP3108753 - DIETARY-FIBER CONTAINING NOODLES AND SOUP STOCK AND MANUFACTURING METHODS FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hirano, Yuzuru
992 Oaza Funatsu
Hidakagawa-cho
Hidaka-gun
Wakayama 644-1111 / JP
[2016/52]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2016/52]
Representative(s)Kindermann, Peter
Karl-Böhm-Strasse 1
85598 Baldham / DE
[2016/52]
Application number, filing date15201158.118.12.2015
[2016/52]
Priority number, dateJP2015012588523.06.2015         Original published format: JP 2015125885
JP2015016131818.08.2015         Original published format: JP 2015161318
[2016/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3108753
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3108753
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:A23L27/10, A23L29/00, A23L33/26, A23L7/109, A23L33/21, A23L23/00
[2017/26]
Former International [2016/52]A23L23/00, A23L7/109, A23L33/21
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/09]
Former [2016/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:NUDEL- UND SUPPENVORRAT BEINHALTENDER DIÄT-BALASTSTOFF SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2016/52]
English:DIETARY-FIBER CONTAINING NOODLES AND SOUP STOCK AND MANUFACTURING METHODS FOR SAME[2016/52]
French:NOUILLES ET SOUPE CONTENANT DES FIBRES DIÉTÉTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANTS[2016/52]
Examination procedure18.12.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/09]
30.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2017Fee for grant paid
18.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
IE18.12.2017
LU18.12.2017
MT18.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
[2018/50]
Former [2018/45]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
IE18.12.2017
LU18.12.2017
MT18.12.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
LU18.12.2017
MT18.12.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL04.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012034368  (OKAZAKI TOMOKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0112]; example 3 * * paragraph [0126]; example 7 * * claims 1-14 *;
 [A]EP0540421  (MATSUTANI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 28, line 53 - page 29, line 12 * * page 47; example 32 * * claims 1-14 *;
 [A]CN103461824B  (UNIV KUNMING SCIENCE & TECH) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] *;
 [A]CN103550274  (UNIV KUNMING SCIENCE & TECH) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] *;
 [A]JP2003009820  (HOSODA SHOTEN KK) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0039] *
by applicantJP2006254901