Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3045394

EP3045394 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REPAIRING A STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2016/29]
Inventor(s)01 / BAIN, David Michael
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
02 / CROTHERS, Phillip John
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
03 / SZARSKI, Martin
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
 [2016/29]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/29]Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date15201161.518.12.2015
[2016/29]
Priority number, dateUS20151459837916.01.2015         Original published format: US201514598379
[2016/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3045394
Date:20.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B64F5/00, B23P6/00, G01N29/26, G05B19/4097, G07C5/00, B64F5/60, G01N29/265
[2019/47]
Former International [2016/29]B64F5/00, B23P6/00, G01N29/26, G05B19/4097, G07C5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR REPARATUR EINER STRUKTUR[2016/29]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REPAIRING A STRUCTURE[2016/29]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÉPARATION D'UNE STRUCTURE[2016/29]
Examination procedure18.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/29]
16.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010161100  (CROTHERS PHILLIP JOHN [AU], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,11-13,15 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0005] * * paragraphs [0012] , [0031] , [0039] * [I] 2-4,7,9,10,14;
 [Y]EP0369891  (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,7 * * column 2, lines 43-48 * * column 7, line 7 - line 41 * * column 8, line 3 - line 26 * * column 10, line 11 - line 37 *;
 [Y]EP2204710  (MUSASHI ENGINEERING INC [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0020] , [0023] * * paragraphs [0058] , [0060] , [0061] *;
 [A]US2010235037  (VIAN JOHN LYLE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 9,12,13 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0053] , [0054] * * paragraphs [0124] , [0158] , [0169] * * paragraph [0171] *