Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3045394 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3045394



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 304
26.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.02.2020 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 21
26.02.2020 Description Search / examination 20
26.02.2020 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
26.02.2020 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.02.2020 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
30.10.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.10.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.10.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.10.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
30.10.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 36
25.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
20.03.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.10.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
17.10.2018 Description Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.10.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.06.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.06.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.02.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.01.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.01.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.09.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.12.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
16.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.12.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
16.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
16.12.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
16.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.07.2016 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
22.06.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.06.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.06.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 3
02.06.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
02.06.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
24.05.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
10.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
25.02.2016 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
18.12.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
18.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
18.12.2015 Description Search / examination 20
18.12.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 Drawings Search / examination 10
18.12.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5