Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3045394


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.12.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.10.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.10.2019 Change - classification published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
18.10.2019 Change - classification published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
25.06.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.10.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.07.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.02.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.01.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.01.2018 First examination report
03.01.2017 Amendment by applicant
17.06.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.07.2016  [2016/29]
17.06.2016 Request for examination filed published on  20.07.2016  [2016/29]
18.12.2015 Change - representative